SD HJR1004 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-15 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 435
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-15 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 435
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To propose a constitutional amendment regarding legislative term limits.
Title
To propose a constitutional amendment regarding legislative term limits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 43 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 43 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-15 | State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 435 | |
2012-02-15 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-13 | Deferred by Chair | |
2012-02-13 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-01 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 245 | |
2012-01-31 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 43, NAYS 26. H.J. 266 | |
2012-01-30 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. H.J. 234 | |
2012-01-30 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-23 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 161 |