SD HJR1004 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - Judiciary Tabled, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 442
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - Judiciary Tabled, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 442
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing and submitting to the electors at the next general election an amendment to Article V, section 1 of the Constitution of the State of South Dakota relating to prohibiting the application of international law, the law of foreign nations, and certain foreign religious or moral codes in the state courts of South Dakota.
Title
Proposing and submitting to the electors at the next general election an amendment to Article V, section 1 of the Constitution of the State of South Dakota relating to prohibiting the application of international law, the law of foreign nations, and certain foreign religious or moral codes in the state courts of South Dakota.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Judiciary Tabled (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | Judiciary Tabled, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 442 | |
2011-02-17 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to House Judiciary, Passed H.J. 212 | |
2011-01-25 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 172 |