SD HJR1001 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Passed on March 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-12 - Delivered to the Secretary of State H.J. 750
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Passed on March 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-12 - Delivered to the Secretary of State H.J. 750
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing and submitting to the electors at the next general election an amendment to Article III, section 25 of the Constitution of the State of South Dakota, relating to the authorization of roulette, keno, and craps in the City of Deadwood.
Title
Proposing and submitting to the electors at the next general election an amendment to Article III, section 25 of the Constitution of the State of South Dakota, relating to the authorization of roulette, keno, and craps in the City of Deadwood.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 37 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 37 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to the Secretary of State H.J. 750 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 629 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 672 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 10. S.J. 557 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 540 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 524 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 501 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 4. S.J. 478 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 188 |
2014-01-30 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 37, NAYS 30. H.J. 182 |
2014-01-29 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 1. H.J. 138 |
2014-01-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-23 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 81 |