SD HCR6014 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-04 - Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Failed, YEAS 9, NAYS 25. S.J. 416
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-04 - Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Failed, YEAS 9, NAYS 25. S.J. 416
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To acknowledge and honor the Native American children who were survivors of the boarding schools in this state.
Title
To acknowledge and honor the Native American children who were survivors of the boarding schools in this state.
Sponsors
Rep. Peri Pourier [D] | Sen. Red Foster [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Concurred in Resolution as Amended (Y: 9 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-02 - House - House of Representatives: Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 52 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House of Representatives: Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 52 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Failed, YEAS 9, NAYS 25. S.J. 416 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | First read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 392 |
2021-03-02 | House | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution as amended, Passed, YEAS 52, NAYS 17. H.J. 458 |
2021-03-02 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend resolution, Passed H.J. 456 Amendment HCR6014F |
2021-03-01 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 436 |
2021-02-25 | House | First read in House and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 398 |