SD HCR6012 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 20-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 0. S.J. 490
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 0. S.J. 490
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting the right to pray in public schools.
Title
Supporting the right to pray in public schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 0. S.J. 490 |
2020-03-11 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 0. H.J. 555 |
2020-03-09 | House | Senate Conference Committee appointments S.J. 470 |
2020-03-09 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 504 |
2020-03-09 | House | House of Representatives Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed H.J. 505 |
2020-03-04 | House | Senate Title amended, Passed S.J. 414 Amendment HCR6012D |
2020-03-04 | House | Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 413 |
2020-03-02 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. |
2020-03-02 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment HCR6012C |
2020-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-19 | House | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 254 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution as amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 4. H.J. 297 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | House of Representatives Motion to amend resolution, Passed H.J. 296 Amendment HCR6012A |
2020-02-13 | Senate | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 278 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 269 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee assignment waived H.J. 255 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | First Reading House H.J. 208 |