SD HCR6007 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-3)
Status: Enrolled on February 3 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 170
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 3 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 170
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Celebrating the sister-state relationship with Taiwan.
Title
Celebrating the sister-state relationship with Taiwan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - Senate - Concurred in Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - Adopt Resolution (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - Adopt Resolution (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 170 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | First read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 158 |
2022-02-01 | House | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 166 |
2022-01-31 | House | Committee assignment waived H.J. 157 |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading House H.J. 136 |