SD HCR6006 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-4)
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 427
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 427
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging efforts to increase competition and transparency among livestock packers.
Title
Urging efforts to increase competition and transparency among livestock packers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Concurred in Resolution as Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources: Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House of Representatives: Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources: Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources: Motion to amend (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources: Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House of Representatives: Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources: Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources: Motion to amend (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 427 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 339 |
2021-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution as amended, Passed, YEAS 51, NAYS 18. H.J. 355 |
2021-02-18 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 2. |
2021-02-18 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. Amendment HCR6006A |
2021-02-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources, Passed H.J. 209 |
2021-02-03 | House | First read in House and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 176 |
2021-02-03 | House | Committee assignment waived H.J. 189 |
2021-02-02 | House | First Reading House H.J. 176 |