SD HCR1006 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 53-4)
Status: Enrolled on February 9 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 301
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 9 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 301
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the United States Forest Service, the National Park Service, the Bureau of Land Management, and other federal agencies to actively manage mountain pine beetle infestations on lands under their control in South Dakota.
Title
Urging the United States Forest Service, the National Park Service, the Bureau of Land Management, and other federal agencies to actively manage mountain pine beetle infestations on lands under their control in South Dakota.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Adopt Resolution (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Adopt Resolution (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 301 | |
2010-02-10 | Introduced S.J. 277 | |
2010-02-09 | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 324 | |
2010-02-04 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. H.J. 310 | |
2010-02-04 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-28 | Introduced and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 214 |