SD HB1325 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the classification of agricultural land according to soil type.
Title
Revise the classification of agricultural land according to soil type.
Sponsors
Rep. Kirk Chaffee [R] | Rep. Rocky Blare [R] | Sen. Mary Duvall [R] | Rep. Caleb Finck [R] |
Rep. Charles Hoffman [R] | Rep. Trish Ladner [R] | Rep. Oren Lesmeister [D] | Rep. Rebecca Reimer [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - Concurred in amendments (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 688 |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2022 H.J. 686 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 536 |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 684 |
2022-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 2. H.J. 630 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 1. S.J. 467 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 456 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 1 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 1 Amendment 1325C |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-22 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 305 |
2022-02-17 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 3. H.J. 374 |
2022-02-15 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. |
2022-02-15 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1325A |
2022-02-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-02 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 181 |