SD HB1281 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Vetoed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Delivered veto sustained to the Secretary of State H.J. 695
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Delivered veto sustained to the Secretary of State H.J. 695
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify the contents of the general appropriations act for fiscal year 2023, pertaining to certain federal moneys and to declare an emergency.
Title
Clarify the contents of the general appropriations act for fiscal year 2023, pertaining to certain federal moneys and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - House - Veto override (Y: 40 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Joint - Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 52 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Joint - Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Joint - Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Do Pass (Y: 52 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6 (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Tabled (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - Referred to (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Joint - Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 52 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Joint - Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Joint - Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Do Pass (Y: 52 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6 (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Tabled (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - Referred to (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Delivered veto sustained to the Secretary of State H.J. 695 |
2022-03-28 | House | Veto override, Failed, YEAS 40, NAYS 30. H.J. 692 |
2022-03-28 | House | Vetoed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 689 |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2022 H.J. 686 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 538 |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 684 |
2022-03-10 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 52, NAYS 16. H.J. 671 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 2. S.J. 525 |
2022-03-10 | House | Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. Amendment 1281I |
2022-03-10 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 669 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee report not adopted, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 519 |
2022-03-10 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 11. H.J. 667 |
2022-03-10 | House | Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. Amendment 1281G |
2022-03-10 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee report not adopted, appoint Conference Committee, Passed H.J. 662 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee report not adopted, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 505 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1281D |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. Amendment 1281C |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee appointments S.J. 489 |
2022-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed H.J. 631 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 471 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 471 Amendment 1281B |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 456 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-24 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 380 |
2022-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 52, NAYS 15. H.J. 456 |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 13. H.J. 430 |
2022-02-22 | House | Committee on Appropriations Report out of committee without recommendation, Passed |
2022-02-22 | House | Recalled from committee (Rule 7-7) House Committee on Appropriations, Passed H.J. 403 |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. H.J. 1 |
2022-02-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. |
2022-02-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-04 | House | Referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 211 |
2022-02-01 | House | First Reading House H.J. 166 |