SD HB1281 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create the state IT modernization fund, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Create the state IT modernization fund, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations: Tabled (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 60 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 60 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-03 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 350 |
2021-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 5. H.J. 389 |
2021-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 389 Amendment 1281B |
2021-02-22 | House | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. |
2021-02-22 | House | Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1281A |
2021-02-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2021-02-16 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 293 |
2021-02-04 | House | First Reading House H.J. 209 |