SD HB1270 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 26, NAYS 39. H.J. 387
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 26, NAYS 39. H.J. 387
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to provide grants for the creation of regional crisis diversion centers and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation to provide grants for the creation of regional crisis diversion centers and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 26 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 26, NAYS 39. H.J. 387 |
2021-02-22 | House | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 2. |
2021-02-22 | House | Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1270A |
2021-02-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2021-02-16 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 293 |
2021-02-04 | House | First Reading House H.J. 209 |