SD HB1239 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 H.J. 544
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 H.J. 544
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit a ban of fuel gas appliances used by consumers.
Title
Prohibit a ban of fuel gas appliances used by consumers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - House - Concurred in amendments (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 H.J. 544 |
2023-03-08 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 08, 2023 H.J. 510 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 461 |
2023-03-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 506 |
2023-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 3. H.J. 496 |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 438 |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 438 Amendment 1239F |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Placed on calendar, Passed S.J. 424 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 45 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 38 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 37 Amendment 1239E |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 292 |
2023-02-15 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 6. H.J. 309 |
2023-02-13 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. |
2023-02-13 | House | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 4. Amendment 1239B |
2023-02-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-02-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-02-01 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 193 |