SD HB1230 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Committee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 4.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establish a fund to assist counties with paying certain expenditures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish a fund to assist counties with paying certain expenditures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-18 - House - House Taxation: Referred as Amended to (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Taxation: Motion to amend (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22HouseCommittee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 4.
2021-02-22HouseCommittee on Appropriations Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 4, NAYS 5.
2021-02-22HouseCommittee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 4, NAYS 4.
2021-02-22HouseCommittee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 4, NAYS 4.
2021-02-22HouseCommittee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1230B
2021-02-22HouseScheduled for hearing H.J. 1
2021-02-18HouseTaxation Referred as Amended to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 2
2021-02-18HouseTaxation Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 1 Amendment 1230A
2021-02-18HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-09HouseFiscal Note Requested, Passed H.J. 1
2021-02-04HouseReferred to House Taxation H.J. 212
2021-02-03HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 190

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback