SD HB1229 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-11 - Signed by Governor H.J. 716
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-11 - Signed by Governor H.J. 716
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise provisions related to the release of medical waste.
Title
Revise provisions related to the release of medical waste.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 61 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 61 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 716 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 600 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 574 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 558 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 534 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 503 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-19 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 447 |
2015-02-18 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 7. H.J. 442 |
2015-02-17 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 416 |
2015-02-12 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 394 |
2015-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 285 |
2015-02-03 | House | First read in House H.J. 266 |