SD HB1228 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-3)
Status: Passed on March 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Signed by the Governor on March 06, 2024 H.J. 484
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-3)
Status: Passed on March 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Signed by the Governor on March 06, 2024 H.J. 484
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide that required exterior hunting garments may be fluorescent pink.
Title
Provide that required exterior hunting garments may be fluorescent pink.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 06, 2024 H.J. 484 |
2024-02-29 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 29, 2024 H.J. 436 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 448 |
2024-02-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 417 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 417 |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Remove from Consent Calendar S.J. 398 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-02-15 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 344 |
2024-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 1. H.J. 336 |
2024-02-13 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. |
2024-02-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-31 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 210 |