SD HB1225 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 534
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for the forfeiture and disposition of certain property utilized in acts of terrorism.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for the forfeiture and disposition of certain property utilized in acts of terrorism.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-03SenateJudiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 534
2016-03-03SenateJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1225ya
2016-03-03SenateJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1225yb
2016-03-03SenateScheduled for hearing
2016-02-25SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 453
2016-02-24HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 675
2016-02-22HouseJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 619
2016-02-22HouseJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1225rc
2016-02-22HouseJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1225rb
2016-02-22HouseJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1225ra
2016-02-22HouseScheduled for hearing
2016-02-04HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 286

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback