SD HB1224 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Taxation Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. H.J. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Taxation Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. H.J. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extend unemployment insurance benefits to individuals who are unemployed because of their refusal to obtain a COVID-19 vaccination.
Title
Extend unemployment insurance benefits to individuals who are unemployed because of their refusal to obtain a COVID-19 vaccination.
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Haugaard [R] | Rep. Phil Jensen [R] | Rep. Chris Karr [R] | Rep. John Mills [R] |
Rep. Carl Perry [R] | Rep. Tony Randolph [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-17 - House - Deferred to another day (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-02-22 - House - Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-17 - House - Deferred to another day (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Taxation Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. H.J. 1 |
2022-02-22 | House | Taxation Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 4, NAYS 9. H.J. 1 |
2022-02-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-02-17 | House | Taxation Deferred to another day, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 1. H.J. 1 |
2022-02-17 | House | Taxation Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 5, NAYS 6. H.J. 1 |
2022-02-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-02-15 | House | Referred to House Taxation H.J. 324 |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading House H.J. 139 |