SD HB1220 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 07, 2024 H.J. 498
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 07, 2024 H.J. 498
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allow an appeal of a decision of the Department of Education regarding special education or related services by a civil action against the department.
Title
Allow an appeal of a decision of the Department of Education regarding special education or related services by a civil action against the department.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Kolbeck [R] | Rep. Tim Reisch [R] | Rep. Hugh Bartels [R] | Sen. Casey Crabtree [R] |
Rep. Linda Duba [D] | Rep. Eric Emery [D] | Rep. David Kull [R] | Rep. Brian Mulder [R] |
Rep. Scott Odenbach [R] | Sen. Carl Perry [R] | Rep. Neal Pinnow [R] | Sen. Jim Stalzer [R] |
Rep. Mike Stevens [R] | Rep. Kenneth Teunissen [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 07, 2024 H.J. 498 |
2024-02-29 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 29, 2024 H.J. 436 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 448 |
2024-02-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 417 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 417 |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 398 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-02-14 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 328 |
2024-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 2. H.J. 322 |
2024-02-12 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. |
2024-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-31 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 212 |