SD HB1219 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 H.J. 761
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding surplus line insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding surplus line insurance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 27, 2019 H.J. 761
2019-03-11SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 H.J. 706
2019-03-11SenateSigned by the President S.J. 675
2019-03-07SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 701
2019-03-06SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 633
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-03-05SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 604
2019-03-05SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-26SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 521
2019-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 519
2019-02-22HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-22HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 478
2019-02-22HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-13HouseCommerce and Energy Title amended, Passed Amendment 1219kta
2019-02-13HouseCommerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1219ka
2019-02-13HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-31HouseReferred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 280
2019-01-30HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 256

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback