SD HB1218 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 25, 2016 H.J. 881
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 25, 2016 H.J. 881
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Require certain notice procedures for any revision of municipal ordinances.
Title
Require certain notice procedures for any revision of municipal ordinances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 25, 2016 H.J. 881 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2016 H.J. 860 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 591 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 845 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 549 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 500 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 453 |
2016-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 686 |
2016-02-23 | House | Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 630 |
2016-02-23 | House | Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1218jb |
2016-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-04 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 284 |