SD HB1214 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-4)
Status: Passed on February 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Signed by the Governor on February 22, 2018 H.J. 544
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-4)
Status: Passed on February 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Signed by the Governor on February 22, 2018 H.J. 544
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the State Conservation Commission and conservation districts.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the State Conservation Commission and conservation districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 22, 2018 H.J. 544 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 21, 2018 H.J. 520 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 513 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 481 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 468 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 444 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 367 |
2018-02-02 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 317 |
2018-02-01 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-02-01 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 273 |
2018-02-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 201 |