SD HB1211 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-10 - House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 28, NAYS 40. H.J. 421
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-10 - House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 28, NAYS 40. H.J. 421
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise budget transfer authority for certain state institutions.
Title
Revise budget transfer authority for certain state institutions.
Sponsors
Rep. Spencer Hawley [D] | Rep. Tad Perry [R] | Rep. Steve Street [D] | Rep. Larry Tidemann [R] |
Rep. Charles Turbiville [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 28 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
House - House Motion to strike the "without recommendation" (Y: 61 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Report out of committee without recommendation (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House Motion to strike the "without recommendation" (Y: 61 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Report out of committee without recommendation (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-10 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 28, NAYS 40. H.J. 421 | |
2012-02-09 | Motion to strike the "without recommendation", Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 9. H.J. 389 | |
2012-02-07 | Appropriations Report out of committee without recommendation, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. H.J. 352 | |
2012-02-07 | Appropriations Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 4, NAYS 5. | |
2012-02-07 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-02 | Deferred by Chair | |
2012-02-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-24 | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 177 |