SD HB1210 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 32-6)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 32-6)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to the Board of Regents to provide grant funding for a new bioproducts facility at the research park in Brookings, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation to the Board of Regents to provide grant funding for a new bioproducts facility at the research park in Brookings, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 47 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - Referred to (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 47 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - Referred to (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 470 |
2021-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2021 H.J. 547 |
2021-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 541 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 443 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-03-01 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 364 |
2021-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 47, NAYS 19. H.J. 417 |
2021-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 417 Amendment 1210C |
2021-02-23 | House | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. |
2021-02-23 | House | Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1210A |
2021-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2021-02-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. |
2021-02-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-03 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 194 |