SD HB1206 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Increase the allowable reimbursement for certain headstones for military personnel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increase the allowable reimbursement for certain headstones for military personnel.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Tabled (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - Referred to (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23HouseCommittee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1.
2021-02-23HouseScheduled for hearing H.J. 1
2021-02-17HouseScheduled for hearing H.J. 1
2021-02-08HouseReferred to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 2.
2021-02-08HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-03HouseReferred to House Military and Veterans Affairs H.J. 195
2021-02-02HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 176

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback