SD HB1204 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 H.J. 761
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Exempt certain sales of goods and services by minors from the sales tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempt certain sales of goods and services by minors from the sales tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 36 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 27, 2019 H.J. 761
2019-03-11SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 H.J. 706
2019-03-07SenateSigned by the President S.J. 647
2019-03-06SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 670
2019-03-05SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 20, NAYS 15. S.J. 612
2019-03-04SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 600
2019-02-28SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 556
2019-02-27SenateTaxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 1. S.J. 532
2019-02-27SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-22SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-12SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 351
2019-02-11HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 36, NAYS 31. H.J. 358
2019-02-08HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 346
2019-02-07HouseTaxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 6. H.J. 316
2019-02-07HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-30HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 254

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback