SD HB1204 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 32, NAYS 38. H.J. 474
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 32, NAYS 38. H.J. 474
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Include certain funds in a school district's local effort for purposes of the state aid to general education formula.
Title
Include certain funds in a school district's local effort for purposes of the state aid to general education formula.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Dryden [R] | Sen. Justin Cronin [R] | Sen. Mary Duvall [R] | Rep. David Lust [R] |
Rep. Mark Mickelson [R] | Sen. Herman Otten [R] | Rep. Jacqueline Sly [R] | Sen. Dean Wink [R] |
Rep. Larry Tidemann [R] | Sen. Corey Brown [R] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Sen. Deb Peters [R] |
Sen. Jim White [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-20 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 32, NAYS 38. H.J. 474 |
2014-02-19 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 454 |
2014-02-13 | House | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. H.J. 417 |
2014-02-13 | House | Appropriations Title amended, Passed Amendment 1204sta |
2014-02-13 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1204sa |
2014-02-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-31 | House | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 249 |