SD HB1200 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2024 H.J. 514
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2024 H.J. 514
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increase the minimum fee required with an application for construction of an energy conversion and transmission facility.
Title
Increase the minimum fee required with an application for construction of an energy conversion and transmission facility.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - House - Concurred in amendments (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2024 H.J. 514 |
2024-03-07 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 07, 2024 H.J. 508 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 507 |
2024-03-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 495 |
2024-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 4. H.J. 475 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 2. S.J. 471 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1200B |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-02-07 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 278 |
2024-02-06 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 1. H.J. 264 |
2024-02-02 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 1 |
2024-02-02 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 1 Amendment 1200A |
2024-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2024-01-29 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 187 |