SD HB1196 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Signed by the Governor on March 03, 2021 H.J. 478
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provide free tuition and fees to visually impaired residents for courses not subsidized by the state general fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide free tuition and fees to visually impaired residents for courses not subsidized by the state general fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Education: Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03HouseSigned by the Governor on March 03, 2021 H.J. 478
2021-02-25HouseDelivered to the Governor on February 25, 2021 H.J. 398
2021-02-24SenateSigned by the President S.J. 344
2021-02-23HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 354
2021-02-22SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 304
2021-02-18SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed S.J. 2
2021-02-18SenateEducation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 2
2021-02-18SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-02-10SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 237
2021-02-09HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 257
2021-02-08HouseEducation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 0.
2021-02-08HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-02HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 177

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback