SD HB1191 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-18 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 1. H.J. 475
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-18 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 1. H.J. 475
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding right-of-way easements for isolated tracts of land.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding right-of-way easements for isolated tracts of land.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Bradford [D] | Sen. Corey Brown [R] | Rep. Thomas Brunner [R] | Sen. Jason Frerichs [D] |
Sen. Art Fryslie [R] | Rep. Tim Rounds [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Tabled (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-18 | House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 1. H.J. 475 | |
2010-02-16 | Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 3. H.J. 395 | |
2010-02-16 | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1191oa | |
2010-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-11 | Transportation Deferred to another day, Passed | |
2010-02-11 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-28 | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 225 |