SD HB1184 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Signed by Governor H.J. 780
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Signed by Governor H.J. 780
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Declare the fourth Saturday in July Day of the American Cowboy.
Title
Declare the fourth Saturday in July Day of the American Cowboy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 780 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 749 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 629 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 672 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 557 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 540 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 524 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 494 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-19 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 366 |
2014-02-18 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 431 |
2014-02-13 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2014-02-13 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 410 |
2014-02-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-30 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 176 |