SD HB1183 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-08 - Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. S.J. 578
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-08 - Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. S.J. 578
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize birth centers to operate in the state.
Title
Authorize birth centers to operate in the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. S.J. 578 | |
2010-03-08 | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 2, NAYS 4. | |
2010-03-08 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-03-03 | Deferred by Chair | |
2010-03-03 | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 2, NAYS 3. | |
2010-03-03 | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1183jd | |
2010-03-03 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-12 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 322 | |
2010-02-11 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 372 | |
2010-02-09 | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 320 | |
2010-02-09 | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1183ja | |
2010-02-09 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-28 | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 223 |