SD HB1172 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require the annual submission of a zero-based budget from certain departments or budget units.
Title
Require the annual submission of a zero-based budget from certain departments or budget units.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 40 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 40 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-26 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 355 |
2020-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 40, NAYS 28. H.J. 391 |
2020-02-24 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. |
2020-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 214 |
2020-01-30 | House | First Reading House H.J. 98 |