SD HB1171 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Passed on March 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-08 - Signed by Governor H.J. 716
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Passed on March 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-08 - Signed by Governor H.J. 716
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the fees for certain special motor vehicle license plates.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the fees for certain special motor vehicle license plates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Signed by Governor H.J. 716 | |
2010-03-03 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 688 | |
2010-03-02 | Signed by President S.J. 532 | |
2010-03-01 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 644 | |
2010-02-25 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 0. S.J. 480 | |
2010-02-24 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-02-24 | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 456 | |
2010-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-12 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 322 | |
2010-02-11 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 4. H.J. 369 | |
2010-02-10 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 359 | |
2010-02-04 | Transportation Title amended, Passed Amendment 1171ota | |
2010-02-04 | Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 313 | |
2010-02-04 | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1171oa | |
2010-02-04 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-28 | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 220 |