SD HB1168 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Commerce and Energy Tabled, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 471
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Commerce and Energy Tabled, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 471
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revise alcoholic beverage licensing relating to hotel facility on-sale licenses.
Title
Revise alcoholic beverage licensing relating to hotel facility on-sale licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Commerce and Energy Tabled (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-20 | House | Commerce and Energy Tabled, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 471 |
2015-02-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-18 | House | Deferred by Chair, Passed |
2015-02-18 | House | Commerce and Energy Title amended, Passed H.J. 423 Amendment 1168sta |
2015-02-18 | House | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1168sa |
2015-02-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to House Commerce and Energy, Passed H.J. 326 |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 228 |
2015-01-28 | House | First read in House H.J. 203 |