SD HB1168 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-12 - Signed by Governor H.J. 742
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-12 - Signed by Governor H.J. 742
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for additional safety measures on amusement rides and to provide a penalty for failure to properly insure an amusement ride or device.
Title
Provide for additional safety measures on amusement rides and to provide a penalty for failure to properly insure an amusement ride or device.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 742 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 694 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 575 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 660 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 532 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 524 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 501 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 491 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 445 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 312 |
2014-02-11 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 6. H.J. 381 |
2014-02-07 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 333 |
2014-02-07 | House | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1168sa |
2014-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-29 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 155 |