SD HB1167 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 842
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 842
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Restructure the policy advisory committee for animal damage control.
Title
Restructure the policy advisory committee for animal damage control.
Sponsors
Sen. Betty Olson [R] | Rep. Don Kopp [R] | Rep. James Schaefer [R] | Rep. Dean Schrempp [D] |
Rep. Mike Verchio [R] | Rep. Larry Rhoden [R] | Sen. Jason Frerichs [D] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] |
Sen. Jim White [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 842 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 814 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 703 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 742 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 647 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 622 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 375 |
2013-02-07 | House | House of Representatives Title amended, Passed H.J. 343 Amendment 1167rta |
2013-02-07 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 1. H.J. 342 |
2013-02-07 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 342 Amendment 1167ra |
2013-02-05 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 3. H.J. 299 |
2013-02-05 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1167tb |
2013-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-23 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 156 |