SD HB1161 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Scheduled for hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Scheduled for hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Update certain provisions regarding pregnancy help center consultations.
Title
Update certain provisions regarding pregnancy help center consultations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-22 | House | Withdrawn at the Request of the Prime Sponsor H.J. 331 |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 178 |
2021-01-28 | House | First Reading House H.J. 148 |
Subjects
South Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://sdlegislature.gov/#/Session/Bill/22354 |
Text | https://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/214820.pdf |