SD HB1161 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-05 - Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 681
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-05 - Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 681
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establish and provide certain incentives for projects that create new jobs or promote economic activity and to establish the rural economic development partnership program.
Title
Establish and provide certain incentives for projects that create new jobs or promote economic activity and to establish the rural economic development partnership program.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Munsterman [R] | Sen. Bernie Hunhoff [D] | Rep. David Lust [R] | Sen. Corey Brown [R] |
Sen. Jason Frerichs [D] | Sen. Russell Olson [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Tabled (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 63 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 63 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 681 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 636 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-21 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 522 |
2013-02-20 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 6. H.J. 467 |
2013-02-20 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 466 Amendment 1161fj |
2013-02-19 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 443 |
2013-02-13 | House | State Affairs Title amended, Passed Amendment 1161ftb |
2013-02-13 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 378 |
2013-02-13 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1161fe |
2013-02-13 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2013-02-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-28 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2013-01-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-23 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 155 |