SD HB1161 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-03 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 609
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-03 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 609
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit the use of certain photo radar speed detection systems and of certain photo monitoring devices to detect red light violations.
Title
Prohibit the use of certain photo radar speed detection systems and of certain photo monitoring devices to detect red light violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 43 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 43 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 609 | |
2011-03-03 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-09 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 375 | |
2011-02-08 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 43, NAYS 24. H.J. 326 | |
2011-02-08 | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 326 Amendment 1161ra | |
2011-02-07 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. H.J. 291 | |
2011-02-07 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-02 | Deferred by Chair | |
2011-02-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-25 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 170 |