SD HB1159 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Signed by the Governor on March 5, 2018 H.J. 696
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Signed by the Governor on March 5, 2018 H.J. 696
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain notification provisions regarding damage of underground facilities.
Title
Revise certain notification provisions regarding damage of underground facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Rounds [R] | Rep. Bob Glanzer [R] | Sen. Tom Pischke [R] | Sen. Tim Reed [R] |
Sen. Susan Wismer [D] | Sen. Al Novstrup [R] | Rep. Phil Jensen [R] | Sen. Jeff Monroe [R] |
Sen. Deb Peters [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 5, 2018 H.J. 696 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 27, 2018 H.J. 615 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 605 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 592 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 558 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 521 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 465 |
2018-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 1. H.J. 421 |
2018-02-12 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-02-12 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 402 |
2018-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-02 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2018-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 175 |