SD HB1155 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2018 H.J. 794
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2018 H.J. 794
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create provisions regarding the language development of deaf and hard-of-hearing students.
Title
Create provisions regarding the language development of deaf and hard-of-hearing students.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Ahlers [D] | Rep. Julie Bartling [D] | Rep. Jamie Smith [D] | Sen. Susan Wismer [D] |
Sen. Reynold Nesiba [D] | Sen. Troy Heinert [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 53 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 53 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2018 H.J. 794 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 759 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on 2:50 p.m., March 8, 2018. H.J. 747 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 737 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 3. H.J. 705 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 671 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 671 Amendment 1155jd |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 609 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1155jc |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 447 |
2018-02-12 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 13. H.J. 409 |
2018-02-07 | House | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 1. H.J. 365 |
2018-02-07 | House | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1155ca |
2018-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 174 |