SD HB1154 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 60-7)
Status: Passed on March 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-12 - Signed by Governor H.J. 742
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 60-7)
Status: Passed on March 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-12 - Signed by Governor H.J. 742
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the commissioner of school and public lands to grant certain surface and subsurface easements to provide access to oil, gas, minerals, and geothermal resources.
Title
Authorize the commissioner of school and public lands to grant certain surface and subsurface easements to provide access to oil, gas, minerals, and geothermal resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 742 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 671 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 563 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 638 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 515 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 496 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 311 |
2014-02-11 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 380 |
2014-02-10 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 365 |
2014-02-07 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 333 |
2014-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-29 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 152 |