SD HB1152 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-3)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Make an appropriation to the Board of Technical Education for a new precision agriculture facility and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Make an appropriation to the Board of Technical Education for a new precision agriculture facility and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Tabled (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - Referred to (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23HouseCommittee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1.
2021-02-23HouseScheduled for hearing H.J. 1
2021-02-16HouseScheduled for hearing H.J. 1
2021-02-05HouseReferred to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0.
2021-02-05HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-03HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-01HouseReferred to House Education H.J. 166
2021-01-28HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 148

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback