SD HB1150 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 842
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 842
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend provisions relating to violations of no contact orders.
Title
Amend provisions relating to violations of no contact orders.
Sponsors
Sen. David Novstrup [R] | Sen. Justin Cronin [R] | Rep. Dan Dryden [R] | Rep. Peggy Gibson [D] |
Rep. Anne Hajek [R] | Rep. Charles Hoffman [R] | Sen. Bernie Hunhoff [D] | Rep. Dan Kaiser [R] |
Rep. David Lust [R] | Rep. Tona Rozum [R] | Rep. Roger Solum [R] | Sen. Shantel Krebs [R] |
Sen. Corey Brown [R] | Sen. Angie Buhl [D] | Sen. Jean Hunhoff [R] | Sen. Mark Kirkeby [R] |
Sen. Larry Lucas [D] | Sen. Deb Peters [R] | Sen. Deb Soholt [R] | Rep. Larry Tidemann [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 842 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 735 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 655 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 598 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 604 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 574 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-31 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 291 |
2013-01-30 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 2. H.J. 256 |
2013-01-28 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 204 |
2013-01-28 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1150ja |
2013-01-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-23 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 152 |