SD HB1146 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-04 - Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-04 - Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establish qualifications for members of the Board of Regents.
Title
Establish qualifications for members of the Board of Regents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Education: Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 46 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Education: Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 46 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Education: Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | Senate | Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 1 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-03-01 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 365 |
2021-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 46, NAYS 20. H.J. 418 |
2021-02-24 | House | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 6. |
2021-02-24 | House | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1146B |
2021-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to House Education H.J. 178 |
2021-01-28 | House | First Reading House H.J. 148 |