SD HB1141 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 25-2)
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2017 H.J. 758
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 25-2)
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2017 H.J. 758
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for a legislative task force to consider certain legislation proposed to revise provisions regarding the constitutional amendment, initiative and referendum process in South Dakota.
Title
Provide for a legislative task force to consider certain legislation proposed to revise provisions regarding the constitutional amendment, initiative and referendum process in South Dakota.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 46 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 39 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 39 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2017 H.J. 758 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2017 H.J. 738 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 686 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 701 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 46, NAYS 19. H.J. 650 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 7. S.J. 607 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 607 Amendment 1141fb |
2017-02-27 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1141ja |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 523 |
2017-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 39, NAYS 29. H.J. 474 |
2017-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 438 |
2017-02-15 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 1. H.J. 399 |
2017-02-15 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1141wa |
2017-02-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-13 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2017-02-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-01 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 246 |