SD HB1141 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2016 H.J. 864
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2016 H.J. 864
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
License persons offering applied behavior analysis services to the public.
Title
License persons offering applied behavior analysis services to the public.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2016 H.J. 864 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 08, 2016 H.J. 845 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 555 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 782 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 751 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 477 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 477 Amendment 1141rb |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 426 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1141fc |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 338 |
2016-02-17 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 1. H.J. 419 |
2016-02-17 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 418 Amendment 1141cc |
2016-02-11 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. H.J. 376 |
2016-02-11 | House | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1141fb |
2016-02-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-28 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 212 |