SD HB1141 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor H.J. 740
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor H.J. 740
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish a date to begin absentee voting and to revise the deadline for the printing of ballots.
Title
Establish a date to begin absentee voting and to revise the deadline for the printing of ballots.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Hansen [R] | Sen. Mark Kirkeby [R] | Rep. Melissa Magstadt [R] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] |
Sen. Thomas Nelson [R] | Sen. Jenna Netherton [R] | Rep. Craig Tieszen [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Motion to amend (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Motion to amend (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor H.J. 740 | |
2011-03-10 | Signed by President S.J. 688 | |
2011-03-10 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 727 | |
2011-03-09 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 706 | |
2011-03-08 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 6. S.J. 661 | |
2011-03-08 | Senate Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 20, NAYS 14. S.J. 660 Amendment 1141fb | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 640 | |
2011-03-02 | State Affairs Title amended, Passed Amendment 1141fta | |
2011-03-02 | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. S.J. 585 | |
2011-03-02 | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1141fa | |
2011-03-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-03 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 318 | |
2011-02-02 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 268 | |
2011-02-01 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 244 | |
2011-02-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-25 | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 165 |