SD HB1135 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Signed by the Governor on February 28, 2024 H.J. 420
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Signed by the Governor on February 28, 2024 H.J. 420
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expand definitions pertaining to the purchasing of grain.
Title
Expand definitions pertaining to the purchasing of grain.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 28, 2024 H.J. 420 |
2024-02-26 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 26, 2024 H.J. 396 |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 405 |
2024-02-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 381 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 376 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-02-14 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 328 |
2024-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 321 |
2024-02-08 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2024-02-08 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1135A |
2024-02-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-23 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 154 |